U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00461-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saenz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 25, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.