U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 08, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 13, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.