U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00005-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores-Cruz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 22, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 02, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 14, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • January 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.