U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swallow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.