U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00501-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alazzam et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 03, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
February, 2025
  • February 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 11, 2024: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • October 11, 2024: [Release Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Hearing]
  • October 10, 2024: [Review of Detention]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 10, 2024: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Strike]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Issuance]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Suppress]
  • December 29, 2022: [Issuance]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order to Seal Document]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • December 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Petition and Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 06, 2022: [Joinder]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Review of Detention]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 15, 2022: [Petition and Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • July 11, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 06, 2022: [Petition and Order]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Re-Appoint Counsel]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 08, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • May 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • May 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • May 10, 2022: [Re-Appoint Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Medical Treatment]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Medical Exam]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 23, 2022: [Discovery]
  • March 23, 2022: [Medical Treatment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Medical Exam]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Dismiss Case for Speedy Trial Violations]
  • March 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 18, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 18, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • February 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Review of Detention]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.