U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00520-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time]
December, 2024
  • December 25, 2024: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • January 18, 2023: [Trial Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Trial Order]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 07, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 01, 2022: [Trial Order]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 26, 2022: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • June 13, 2022: [Seal]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 10, 2022: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.