U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00377-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 18, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.