U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00529-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.