U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bravo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order and Report on Offender Under Supervision]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 20, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.