U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Archuleta
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • October 06, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 06, 2022: [Brady Order]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • September 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.