U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quintero-Medina
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 17, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.