U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00428-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Petersen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 27, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.