U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hare
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Suppress]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 03, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.