U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kelley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 09, 2022: [Detention]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 27, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.