U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00480-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Simmons
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.