U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rada
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2022: [Petition and Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.