U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bazzaz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Associate Case]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • March 22, 2022: [Reassign Case]
  • March 20, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 27, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.