U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Young
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • October 06, 2022: [Travel]
  • October 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • January 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.