U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.