U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nye
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • March 28, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.