U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00524-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jolley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [U-ACT Referral Order]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Release Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 02, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.