U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velasquez-Cruz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2022: [Exclude]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • February 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 02, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.