U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saseve
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.