U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00518-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mullins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 28, 2022: [Petition and Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order and Report on Offender Under Supervision]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 04, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 03, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.