U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weaver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [U-ACT Referral Order]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 04, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 03, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.