U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nelson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Petition and Order]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 11, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.