U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Phister
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order for Exam]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.