U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [RISE or HOPE Program Referral Order]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Release Order]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 09, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • February 09, 2022: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.