U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Navarro-Perez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 08, 2022: [Strike]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.