U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Naa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.