U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sandoval
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 18, 2022: [Furlough]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 24, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.