U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Preciado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.