U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Trial Order]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 10, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.