U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortega-Medina
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 09, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 10, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 10, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • February 10, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.