U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beltran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2022: [Consent Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • February 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 11, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.