U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez-Molina
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.