U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Samaniego et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Re-Appoint Counsel]
  • October 20, 2022: [Sever Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • March 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • February 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 15, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.