U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 19, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 16, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.