U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 18, 2023: [Strike]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • January 03, 2023: [Petition and Order]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 08, 2022: [Petition and Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 26, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.