U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00009-12
  • Case Name: USA v. RUBIO-QUINTANA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 15, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • July 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 23, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • February 16, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.