U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vu
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Review of Detention]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 17, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.