U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jensen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 03, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 24, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.