U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maxwell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • February 18, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.