U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 19, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.