U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hanrath et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Petition and Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 09, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 09, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Detention]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 22, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.