U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz-Rios et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 04, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Departure from Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • March 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 01, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • February 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.