U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 24, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.