U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Collins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 07, 2022: [Detention]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.