U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Myore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Release Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.