U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cesspooch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Release Order]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 25, 2022: [Review of Detention]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 04, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Detention]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.